Jones v. Conway, Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Kaala D Jones
Defendant: Jimmy Weser, Conway, Arkansas, City of, Tanner Williams, Jody Spradlin and Brandon Huff
Case Number: 4:2021cv00205
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams.(Adams, Jenna)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams (Adams, Jenna)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Jody Spradlin served on 3/30/2021. (bmd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. The City of Conway, Office of City Attorney served on 3/30/2021. (bmd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. The City of Conway, Office of Mayor served on 3/30/2021. (bmd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Brandon Huff served on 3/30/2021. (bmd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Jimmy Weser served on 3/30/2021. (bmd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Tanner Williams served on 3/31/2021. (bmd)
March 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kaala D Jones. No summons issued. (Fee of $402 paid, Receipt #LIT081275.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Conway, Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Weser
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway, Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Williams
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Spradlin
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Huff
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaala D Jones
Represented By: Emily A. Neal
Represented By: Lance Cox
Represented By: William Conner Eldridge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?