Berry v. Capella University et al
Plaintiff: Sharllette Berry
Defendant: Capella University LLC, Strategic Education Inc and Capella University
Case Number: 4:2021cv00284
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capella University and Strategic Education Inc, filed by Sharllette Berry" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Capella University and Strategic Education Inc, filed by Sharllette Berry (Attachments: #1 Document Entry of Appearance)(Austin, LaTonya) (Docket text modified on 6/7/2021 to correct parties and remove jury demand.)(cmn)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Berry's claims are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 6/4/2021. If Berry does not file a proposed amended complaint by that date, the Court will enter Judgment, dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/5/2021. (jak)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #12 , #14 , & #15 , granted. Kathryn M. Nash, Richard Dion Farganis, and Neil Goldsmith are admitted pro hac vice. The Court directs the Clerk to return the three Pro Hac Vice fees paid on 22 April 2021 to counsel. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/28/2021. (slb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Neil Goldsmith. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3995624. Filed by Capella University LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Neil Goldsmith)(Buckley, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard Dion Farganis. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3995621. Filed by Capella University LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Dion Farganis)(Buckley, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kathryn Nash - Pro Hac Vice by Capella University LLC. re #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Capella University LLC. (Buckley, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kathryn Nash. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3995605. Filed by Capella University LLC (Buckley, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Buckley on behalf of Capella University LLC (Buckley, Mary)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Capella University LLC (Haupt, Robert)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Capella University LLC. (Haupt, Robert)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capella University LLC (Haupt, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #4 , #5 , & #6 , are denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/14/2021. (slb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard Dion Farganis. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3989111. Filed by Capella University LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haupt, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Neil Goldsmith. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3989110. Filed by Capella University LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haupt, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kathryn M. Nash. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3989106. Filed by Capella University LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haupt, Robert)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Capella University LLC filed by Sharllette Berry.(ajt)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Capella University LLC from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-21-1. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT081618. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2021: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Capella University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharllette Berry
Represented By: Tabatha Branch
Represented By: LaTonya Laird Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capella University LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Education Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capella University
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Represented By: Kathryn M. Nash
Represented By: Dion Farganis
Represented By: Neil Goldsmith
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?