Lee et al v. VFS Leasing Co et al
Plaintiff: Edward Graves and Arlina Lee
Defendant: Kenneth Bailey, American Theatre Productions, VFS Leasing Co and John Does
Case Number: 4:2021cv00316
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 motion to substitute attorney. Attorney Jordan Shelby Phillips terminated.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/2021.(gmh)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs (Marlin, Russell)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendant Kenneth Bailey, filed by Arlina Lee. Kenneth Bailey served on 5/22/2021. (Marlin, Russell)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/24/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/7/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/11/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/17/2021. (ljb)
May 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Bailey and returned to counsel for plaintiff.(jap)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Theatre Productions, Kenneth Bailey, VFS Leasing Co.(Keller, Thomas)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Arlina Lee, Edward Graves.(jak)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Theatre Productions, Kenneth Bailey, VFS Leasing Co from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-21-288.(Fee of $402; receipt number LIT081729) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. VFS Leasing Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bailey
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Theatre Productions
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VFS Leasing Co
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: Thomas G. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Graves
Represented By: Jordan Shelby Phillips
Represented By: Russell D. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlina Lee
Represented By: Jordan Shelby Phillips
Represented By: Russell D. Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?