Jordan v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Heather Jordan
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00359
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Edie R Ervin
2 Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Renee Jones on behalf of Social Security Administration, Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel (Jones, Danielle)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Jordan. Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel served on 6/1/2021. (Stevens, Mickey)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/28/2021. (kbc)
May 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Plaintiff's counsel to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/4/2021. (jbh)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Heather Jordan. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heather Jordan. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Jordan
Represented By: Mickey Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Danielle Renee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?