Crain v. First Security Bank et al
Plaintiff: Marc T Crain
Defendant: First Security Bank, Larry P Crain, Reynie Rutledge and John Rutledge
Case Number: 4:2021cv00367
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 Order, by Marc T Crain. (jap)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Order by Marc T Crain. (jap)
June 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service, pursuant to #7 Order and #8 Response. (jbh)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Crain has paid the filing fee. Doc. #5 . The next issue is service of process. Crain must provide the Clerk with a current mailing address for each defendant by 6/15/2021. The Clerk must then issue summonses and provide them and a copy of the complaint to the U.S. Marshal. The Court directs the Marshal to serve process, without prepayment of fees, by certified mail, restricted delivery, return receipt requested. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2021. (jbh)
June 1, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ajt)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/25/2021. (jak)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $402 received, receipt number LIT082208. (bmd)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court amends its 05/12/2021 Order to reflect the current filing fee. Crain must pay the $402 filing fee and must do so by 06/17/2021. If no payment is made by then, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 05/13/2021. (ajt)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with instructions. Crain must pay the $400 filing fee by 6/17/2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2021. (jak)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Marc T Crain.(ajt)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marc T Crain. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain v. First Security Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Security Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry P Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc T Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?