Goodwin v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Starekeizza Goodwin
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00375
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starekeizza Goodwin. Social Security Administration served on 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit domestic return receipt)(Carroll, Shannon)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 05/28/2021. (ajt)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (llg)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #2 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a)and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Starekeizza Goodwin, on behalf of a minor child, has filed a pleading that the Clerk of the Court has construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court has reviewed the motion and finds that it should be, and is, granted. Plaintiff may proceed without the prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 05/10/2021. (jfc)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Starekeizza Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2021: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Starekeizza Goodwin. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starekeizza Goodwin
Represented By: Shannon Muse Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?