Uhiren v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sabrina Uhiren and Sabrina Antimo
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00383
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from state farm by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Sayes, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Admissions by Sabrina Uhiren.(Hughes, Karen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/30/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/13/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/01/2021. (tmw)
June 1, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Kristine G. Baker. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ajt)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing the Complaint against Separate Defendant Ada Ann Wright. Signed by Circuit Judge Parker S. Huckabee. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ada Ann Wright, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Sabrina Uhiren. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ada Ann Wright, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Sabrina Uhiren. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ada Ann Wright. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ada Ann Wright, filed by Sabrina Uhiren. (jbh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-20-00492. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT082063. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uhiren v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Uhiren
Represented By: Karen Jean Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Antimo
Represented By: Karen Jean Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James Melton Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?