Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC and Rock Dental Missouri LLC
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00526
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/28/21. (mmb)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC, Rock Dental Missouri LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carney, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Cincinnati Insurance Company (Hammett, Ericka)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Hammett, Ericka)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cincinnati Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Index of Insurer-Favorable COVID-19 Authorities re: no loss (of) or damage to property, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - CDC Reopening Guidance for Cleaning and Disinfecting (4/28/2020), #3 Exhibit Ex. C - CDC Guidance for Cleaning and Disinfecting Your Home (6/17/2021), #4 Exhibit Ex. D - CDC Science Brief: SARS-CoV-2 and Surface (Fomite) Transmission for Indoor Community Environments)(Hammett, Ericka)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/16/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/30/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 7/9/21. (mmb)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Ericka C. Hammett is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/9/21. (mmb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ericka C Hammett filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Fee $100.00. Receipt#LIT082843. (fjg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cincinnati Insurance Company, filed by Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC, Rock Dental Missouri LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082562.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Dental Arkansas PLLC
Represented By: James Allen Carney, Jr.
Represented By: Jake G. Windley
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rock Dental Missouri LLC
Represented By: James Allen Carney, Jr.
Represented By: Jake G. Windley
Represented By: Randall Keith Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Ericka C. Hammett
Represented By: Scott Michael Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?