Holt v. Arkansas Department of Agriculture
Plaintiff: Sarah Holt
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 4:2021cv00667
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Arkansas Department of Agriculture. (Bird, William)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sarah Holt. (Burks, Christopher)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arkansas Department of Agriculture. (Bird, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arkansas Department of Agriculture (Bird, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Bird, III on behalf of Arkansas Department of Agriculture (Bird, William)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arkansas Department of Agriculture filed by Sarah Holt. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083059.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Arkansas Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Holt
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Agriculture
Represented By: William C. Bird, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?