Edward Jones Trust Company v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: Edward Jones Trust Company
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00676
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/21. (rdr)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Meyer, Christopher)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Edward Jones Trust Company. (Hardin, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Edward Jones Trust Company. (Hardin, John)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Donovan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Donovan, Richard)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/4/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/17/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/21/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/30/2021. (ljb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Meyer, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Note)(Meyer, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to answer. Wells Fargo Bank NA answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/18/21. (rdr)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Meyer, Christopher)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time to answer.Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/3/2021.(gmh)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Meyer, Christopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank NA, filed by Edward Jones Trust Company.(kdr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Lonoke County Circuit Court, Case Number 43CV-21-409. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083069. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward Jones Trust Company v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jones Trust Company
Represented By: John Thomas Hardin
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?