Skinner v. Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC
Plaintiff: Dalton Skinner
Defendant: Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00746
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO STAY CASE to Enable Parties to Pursue Mediation; and directing Parties to have a date certain to mediate this matter on or before 4/6/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 10/14/2021. (ldb)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Stay Case to Enable Parties to Pursue Mediation by Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC. (Sager, Heather)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Goldberg on behalf of Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC (Goldberg, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Murray Sager on behalf of Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC (Sager, Heather)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC filed by Dalton Skinner. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083411.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Skinner
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Military Communities Mgmt LLC
Represented By: Heather Murray Sager
Represented By: Matthew L. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?