Hawkins v. Counseling and Education Center Inc et al
Plaintiff: Francine Hawkins
Defendant: Phillips County Development Center, Counseling and Education Center Inc, City of Helena-West Helena Arkansas, Kevin Smith, PCDC, Arkansas Department of Human Services and Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 4:2021cv00759
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Francine Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Document Brief in Support)(Clifford, Eugene)
September 29, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Phillips County Development Center (Miller, Stuart)
September 27, 2021 Filing 22 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/19/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/3/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 10/17/2022 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arkansas Department of Human Services. (Adkins, Reid)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Arkansas Department of Human Services (Adkins, Reid)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Counseling and Education Center Inc.(Schieffler, Edward)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Phillips County Development Center.(Miller, Stuart)
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (incomplete image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/13/2021. (amr)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint docket # 11. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/13/2021. (amr)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint docket #11. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/13/2021. (amr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Clarify Motion to Dismiss as moot by Francine Hawkins (Clifford, Eugene)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of, Kevin Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mann, William)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Francine Hawkins(Clifford, Eugene)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Counseling and Education Center Inc answer due 9/24/2021.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/27/2021. (amr)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 8/26/2021 as indicated on the document. (kbc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Helena-West Helena Arkansas and Kevin Smith. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT A to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Counseling and Education Center Inc. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint by Counseling and Education Center Inc. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Arkansas Department of Human Services. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Arkansas Department of Human Services. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Phillips County Development Center. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 SEPARATE DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Phillips County Development Center. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Francine Hawkins. (llg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Helena-West Helena Arkansas and Kevin Smith from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-04417. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT083447. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) Docket entry modified on 8/27/2021 to correct file date. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Counseling and Education Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips County Development Center
Represented By: Lindsey Catherine Vechik
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counseling and Education Center Inc
Represented By: Edward H. Schieffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Helena-West Helena Arkansas
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCDC
Represented By: Lindsey Catherine Vechik
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Human Services
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena-West Helena Arkansas, City of
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Hawkins
Represented By: Eugene Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?