Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company v. Ace American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00793
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company (Clark, Autumn)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Ace American Insurance Company (Lowther, Edwin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/29/2021 and Jury Trial set for 12/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/8/2021. (hml)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Company.(Cox, Laura)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ace American Insurance Company filed by Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company.(ajt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace American Insurance Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-21-475. Fee $402 received, receipt number LIT083580. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company v. Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Bluff Sand and Gravel Company
Represented By: Autumn Clark
Represented By: William McShane Bridgforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Laura E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?