Smith v. Payne
Plaintiff: Daniel Smith
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2021cv00794
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
2 Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE re #12 Order by Daniel Smith. (llg)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Petitioner Williams to file a Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss on or before 11/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/20/2021. (kdr)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dexter Payne. (Harris, Christian)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne (Harris, Christian)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #8 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker. (cmn)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: I was serving on the Arkansas Court of Appeals when Smith's direct appeal was pending in that Court. I therefore recuse. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2021. (kdr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Scholfield Harris on behalf of Dexter Payne (Harris, Christian)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion for Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/24/2021. (csf)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Status by Daniel Smith. (llg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER #1 directing the Clerk of the Court to serve by mail a copy of #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General; and directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/23/2021. (kdr)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00 Received, receipt number LIT083779. (mdo)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send Smith an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Form AO-240); and directing Smith, if he wishes to continue with this action, to either (1) file the completed Application, including the Certificate of Prisoner Accounts, or (2) pay the $5.00 filing fee in full, on or before 10/08/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/08/2021. (ajt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Daniel Smith. (Filing Fee not submitted, Motion to Proceed IFP not filed)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Christian Scholfield Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?