Whorton et al v. Grove C-Store LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Whorton and Jeffery Wilkey
Defendant: Grove C-Store LLC, Venkata Kiran Kumar Melapu and Sravanthi Joginipelli
Case Number: 4:2021cv00795
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Ford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ford, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grove C-Store LLC, Sravanthi Joginipelli, Venkata Kiran Kumar Melapu.(Potts, Dylan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Hugh Potts on behalf of All Defendants (Potts, Dylan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Whorton. Venkata Kiran Kumar Melapu served on 9/29/2021. (Sanford, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Whorton. Sravanthi Joginipelli served on 9/29/2021. (Sanford, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Whorton. Grove C-Store LLC served on 9/29/2021. (Sanford, Joshua)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kristen Whorton, Jeffery Wilkey. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083581.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whorton et al v. Grove C-Store LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Whorton
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wilkey
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grove C-Store LLC
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venkata Kiran Kumar Melapu
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sravanthi Joginipelli
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?