Stanley v. Canino et al
Plaintiff: John Stanley, Jr
Defendant: Stephen Canino, Tim Ryals, Greenbrier Arkansas, City of and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv00797
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Rule 26(f) Report due date as 12/29/2021 as marked on the Order. (jak)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by John Stanley, Jr. (Gillham, Lucien)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by John Stanley, Jr. (Gillham, Lucien)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/16/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/29/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/10/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/22/2021. (ljb) (Docket text modified on 10/26/2021 to correct the Rule 26(f) Report due date)(jak)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 10/25/2021. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2021. (rmg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Party by All Plaintiffs (Sutter, Luther)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Stephen Canino, Tim Ryals.(Jones, Jamie Marie)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stanley, Jr. Tim Ryals served on 9/20/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stanley, Jr. (Sutter, Luther)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stanley, Jr. Stephen Canino served on 9/15/2021. (Sutter, Luther)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Greenbrier Arkansas, City of. (Mann, William)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Greenbrier Arkansas, City of (Mann, William)
September 14, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the date of service as 9/13/2021 as marked on the document. (jak)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Stanley, Jr. Greenbrier Arkansas, City of served on 9/13/2021. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 9/14/2021 to correct the date of service) (jak)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF LUTHER SUTTER (ajt)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by John Stanley, Jr. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083597.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Canino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stanley, Jr
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Canino
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ryals
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Arkansas, City of
Represented By: William C. Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?