Hampton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Anna L Hampton
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00817
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/01/2021. (llg)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis (DE #1) is granted. The applicant may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/16/2021. (get)
September 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kdr)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Anna L Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anna L Hampton. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna L Hampton
Represented By: Iva Nell Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?