Padgett v. Van Buren County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Reed Padgett
Defendant: Van Buren County Detention Center and Lucas Emberton
Case Number: 4:2021cv00830
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Reed Padgett re #4 Order, #5 Judgment, #6 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Padgett's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2021. (jak)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER withdrawing the reference. Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2021. (jak)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to submit the $402 statutory filing fee or a completed in forma pauperis application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis application and calculation sheet; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Van Buren County Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/21/2021. (ldb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zachary Reed Padgett.(kdr)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zachary Reed Padgett. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Van Buren County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Reed Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Emberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?