McClendon v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee McClendon
Defendant: A Davis, Bertha Lowe, Eric Higgins, Pulaski County Sheriff's Office, Pulaski County Detention Facility and Does Any and all parties involved in violation of HIPPA laws
Case Number: 4:2021cv00834
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Eddie Lee McClendon re #5 Order, #6 Judgment, #7 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. (fjg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #5 Order entered separately today, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice, and this case is closed. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2021. (llg)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 Recommendation in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice #2 Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; counting dismissal of this action as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/12/2021. (llg)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted #2 . Dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/22/2021. (lej)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #1 . The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the PCDF Jail Administrator. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/22/2021. (lej)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Eddie Lee McClendon.(kdr)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Lee McClendon. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClendon v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Any and all parties involved in violation of HIPPA laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?