Blakely v. Mead et al
Plaintiff: Reo Blakely
Defendant: Tony Thomas, Daniel S Mead, Frank O'Mara and Cameron Azari
Case Number: 4:2021cv00845
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from the U.S. District Court, District of Maryland; Case Number 8:21-cv-02257. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to Transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern Districk of Arkansas for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/22/2021. (c/m 9/22/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 9/22/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reo Blakely(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2021: #1 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope) (heps, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 9/22/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cameron Azari, Daniel S. Mead, Frank O'Mara, Tony Thomas, filed by Reo Blakely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2021: #3 Attachment, #4 Envelope) (heps, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from mdd on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. Mead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reo Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Azari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?