Shaw v. Quest Transportation LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra Shaw
Defendant: Quest Transportation LLC, Salem Place Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Inc and Salem Place Nursing Center Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00874
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Defendants OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Young, Harold)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/30/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/14/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/04/2021. (tmw)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Quest Transportation LLC, Salem Place Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Inc, Salem Place Nursing Center Inc.(Young, Harold)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cassandra Shaw. (jbh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-05923. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT083917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Quest Transportation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Shaw
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Transportation LLC
Represented By: Harold Wayne Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Place Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Inc
Represented By: Harold Wayne Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Place Nursing Center Inc
Represented By: Harold Wayne Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?