Burton v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery Burton
Defendant: Jackson and Shipman
Case Number: 4:2021cv00973
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffery Burton. (llg)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Burton a 1983 complaint form that is labeled "Amended Complaint;" and directing Burton to within, 30 days of the date of this Order, file an Amended Complaint that complies with the directions in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/10/2021. (kdr)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP application; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid; and directing the clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2021. (kdr)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery Burton.(kdr)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffery Burton. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?