Green Bay Packaging Inc v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Green Bay Packaging Inc
Defendant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO and United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965
Case Number: 4:2021cv00978
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss, Reply Brief filed by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO, United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965. (Shapiro, Sasha)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubin, John)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 , #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Rubin shall appear as counsel of record for plaintiff. Ms. Shapiro shall appear as counsel of record for defendants. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/30/2021. (jbh)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/28/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/11/2022; Bench Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/29/2021. (tmw)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sasha Shapiro. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4153465. Filed by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO, United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965 (McGowan, Thomas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO, United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McGowan, Thomas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO, United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965 (McGowan, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (Staley, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Proof of Service on Defendants, filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. Green Bay Packaging Inc served on 11/4/2021. (Staley, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John A. Rubin. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4146150. Filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc (Staley, Thomas)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (jbh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084248.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Bay Packaging Inc v. United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Bay Packaging Inc
Represented By: Thomas B. Staley
Represented By: John A. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO
Represented By: Sasha Shapiro
Represented By: Thomas H. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel Paper and Forestry Rubber Manufacturing Energy Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO Local 13-1965
Represented By: Sasha Shapiro
Represented By: Thomas H. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?