Lewis v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Donald Jason Lewis
Defendant: Heidi Parker and Tracy Sutterfield
Case Number: 4:2021cv00981
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, the Court will allow Lewis thirty days from date of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint containing additional information to correct the deficiencies in his #2 Complaint and #4 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/29/2021. (csf)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP Motion; denying as moot #3 second IFP Motion; directing monthly payments be collected from plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Searcy County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/18/2021. (kdr)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donald Jason Lewis.(kdr)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Jason Lewis. (kdr)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Jason Lewis. (llg)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Jason Lewis. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jason Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sutterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?