Doe v. Greenbrier School District
Plaintiff: Doe
Defendant: Greenbrier School District
Case Number: 4:2021cv00987
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12131
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/28/2022. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/14/2022. Jury Trial set for 12/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/21/21. (mmb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER OF RECUSAL. I recuse in order to avoid the appearance of an impropriety. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/20/2021. (hml)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Stay Administrative Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Greenbrier School District. (Kees, William)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Administrative Order or in the Alternative Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Greenbrier School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kees, William)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against Doe by Greenbrier School District.(Kees, William)
December 20, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on 5 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Doe with Jury Demand against Greenbrier School District (Fee $ 402; Receipt Number LIT084294). Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Greenbrier School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe
Represented By: Theresa Lynn Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier School District
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?