Master Saddles LLC v. Andrews
Plaintiff: Master Saddles LLC
Defendant: Joshua Andrews
Case Number: 4:2021cv01015
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/22/2022. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/7/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/3/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/13/21. (mmb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Robert Davis on behalf of Joshua Andrews (Davis, Jason)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joshua Andrews.(Davis, Jason)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Master Saddles LLC. Joshua Andrews served on 11/22/2021. (Baker, Adrienne)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Aaron K. Haar is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/5/21. (mmb)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Maria Crimi Speth is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/5/21. (mmb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Aaron K. Haar. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4138660. Filed by Master Saddles LLC (Lowry, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Maria Crimi Speth. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4138649. Filed by Master Saddles LLC (Lowry, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark submitted by the Clerk's Office to the Director of the U.S. Patent or Trademark Office on 11/5/2021. (cdw)
November 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to Joshua Andrews and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
November 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to Joshua Andrews and returned to counsel for plaintiff.(jap)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joshua Andrews, filed by Master Saddles LLC. No summons issued. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084327.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Master Saddles LLC v. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Master Saddles LLC
Represented By: Aaron K. Haar
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Meredith Kristin Lowry
Represented By: Aaron Keith Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Andrews
Represented By: Jason Robert Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?