Smith v. Arkansas Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Alika M Smith
Defendant: Arkansas Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2021cv01068
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Arkansas Federal Credit Union.(Vandiver, Brian)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Arkansas Federal Credit Union answer due 12/15/2021. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/2/2021. (amr)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arkansas Federal Credit Union (Vandiver, Brian)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the parties as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Federal Credit Union, filed by Alika M Smith" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Federal Credit Union, filed by Alika M Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatcher, Lorraine) (Docket text modified on 11/12/2021 to correct parties.)(cmn)
November 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to Arkansas Federal Credit Union and returned to plaintiff's attorney for service. (jap)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Federal Credit Union, filed by Alika M Smith. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084396. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Arkansas Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alika M Smith
Represented By: Lorraine Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Brian Anthony Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?