Sheridan v. PACC Senior Care LLC
Plaintiff: Janine Sheridan
Defendant: PACC Senior Care LLC doing business as Home Instead Senior Care
Case Number: 4:2021cv01124
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT To Join Collective Action filed by Janine Sheridan as to Margaret Cloutier. (Burks, Christopher)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/8/2022 and Bench Trial set for 4/4/2023 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/20/2021. (hml)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT To Join Collective Action filed by Janine Sheridan as to Pamela Stevenson. (Burks, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PACC Senior Care LLC.(Owens, Danielle)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Hugh Potts on behalf of PACC Senior Care LLC (Potts, Dylan)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle W. Owens on behalf of PACC Senior Care LLC (Owens, Danielle)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Janine Sheridan against PACC Senior Care LLC (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT084540). Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheridan v. PACC Senior Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Sheridan
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACC Senior Care LLC doing business as Home Instead Senior Care
Represented By: Danielle W. Owens
Represented By: Dylan Hugh Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?