Thompson v. Conagra Brands et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Faye Thompson and Andrew William Agnew
Defendant: Conagra Brands and Teamsters Local Union 878
Case Number: 4:2021cv01133
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/2021. Nunc pro tunc 11/18/2021. (Docketed pursuant to instruction from Chambers.)(cmn)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 #2 Motions to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to sever the case and to file all filings in the underlying case in the new case; directing the Clerk to assign the new case directly to Judge Rudofsky; and directing each Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee of $402 within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/20/2021. (ldb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by all Plaintiffs. (fjg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew William Agnew. (cmn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Wanda Faye Thompson. (cmn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Wanda Faye Thompson and Andrew William Agnew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew William Agnew. (jbh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wanda Faye Thompson. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Conagra Brands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Faye Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew William Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 878
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?