Knight v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donna Knight
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01138
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/26/2022. Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/9/2022. Jury Trial set for 11/29/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/23/21. (mmb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Geico Advantage Insurance Company. (jbh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Geico Advantage Insurance Company, filed by Donna Knight. (jbh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Advantage Insurance Company from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-21-00761. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT084555. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Knight
Represented By: Craig Daniel Friedman
Represented By: M. Ethan Sartor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?