Chadwick v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rose Chadwick
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01161
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Eric L. Robertson. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4181519. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Peter W. Herzog, III. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4181512. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Notice, Doc. #3 , appreciated. Unopposed motion, Doc. #5 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 28 January 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2021. (slb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Confirmation of Acceptance of Service on the Part of Defendant by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Shane Strabala on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Strabala, Richard)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Rose Chadwick; Case Number 1:19-cv-72-DPM. (ldb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Class Action Complaint. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The cover sheet was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rose Chadwick against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT084647). Summons issued and returned to counsel. (ldb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Added on 11/29/2021)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadwick v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Chadwick
Represented By: Jake G. Windley
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric L. Robertson
Represented By: Peter W. Herzog, III
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?