Gray v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Gray
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Bemis Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv01208
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer due 2/25/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/10/2022. (hml)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Hays, Jeremy)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER - ERISA CASE: Stipulated record to be filed within 45 days of this Order. Plaintiff's brief due 21 days after the filing of the stipulated record. Defendants' brief due 21 days after the Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, due 10 days thereafter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/19/2022. (hml)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bemis Company, Inc. Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/19/2022. (hml)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Answer due 2/11/2022. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/12/2022. (hml)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Hays, Jeremy)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Bemis Company, Inc. by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hays, Jeremy)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hays, Jeremy)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kirk Gray. Fee $402; Receipt No. LIT084901. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Gray
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jeremy W. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?