Hansberry v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lois Hansberry
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01219
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/25/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/11/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/28/2021. (tmw)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company.(Donovan, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company filed by Lois Hansberry. (llg)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-21-01095. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT084947. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansberry v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Hansberry
Represented By: Floyd A. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?