Agnew v. Conagra Brands et al
Plaintiff: Andrew William Agnew
Defendant: Conagra Brands and Teamsters Local Union 878
Case Number: 4:2021cv01222
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/20/2022. (hml)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 motion to appoint counsel; directing the Clerk of Court to issue Summonses to Defendants at the addresses provided in the Complaint and mail it, along with a copy of the Complaint, to Mr. Agnew so that Mr. Agnew can complete service of process. Mr. Agnew has until Tuesday, 4/19/2022 to complete service and file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/20/2022. (jbh) (Docket entry modified on 1/20/2022 to establish linkage and correct description.)(cmn)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and correct description to include, "ORDER denying without prejudice #6 motion to appoint counsel..." as indicated by the document. (cmn)
January 20, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (jbh)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 Supplement to #4 Amended Complaint filed by Andrew William Agnew. (kth)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee received. $402.00, receipt # LIT085279. (fjg)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER provisionally granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/21/2021. Nunc pro tunc 11/18/2021. (Docketed pursuant to instruction from Chambers.)(cmn) (Docket entry modified on 12/21/2021 to correct linkage.)(cmn)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct linkage to #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (cmn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew William Agnew. (Docketed pursuant to #1 Order, originally filed in 4:21-cv-01133-LPR.) (cmn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andrew William Agnew. (Docketed pursuant to #1 Order, originally filed in 4:21-cv-01133-LPR.)(cmn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andrew William Agnew. (Docketed pursuant to #1 Order, originally filed in 4:21-cv-01133-LPR.)(cmn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew William Agnew. (Docketed pursuant to #1 Order, originally filed in 4:21-cv-01133-LPR.) (cmn)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER denying Motions to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to sever the case and to file all filings in the underlying case in the new case; directing the Clerk to assign the new case directly to Judge Rudofsky; and directing each Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee of $402 within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/20/2021. (Originally filed in 4:21-cv-01133-LPR)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnew v. Conagra Brands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew William Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union 878
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?