Dahlgren v. St Francis House Inc
Plaintiff: Catherine Dahlgren
Defendant: St Francis House Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv00016
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/26/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/9/2022; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 8/21/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/17/2022. (ljb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by St Francis House Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jones, Daveante)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daveante Jones on behalf of St Francis House Inc (Jones, Daveante)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St Francis House Inc, filed by Catherine Dahlgren. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085192. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlgren v. St Francis House Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Dahlgren
Represented By: Sydney L. Rasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Francis House Inc
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?