Tacker v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Christa Tacker
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Kindred Healthcare LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00040
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Kindred Healthcare, LLC by Christa Tacker. (Lacy, Brandon)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 31 March 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/22/2022. (slb)
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kindred Healthcare LLC (Friedman, Emily)
February 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Friedman on behalf of Kindred Healthcare LLC (Friedman, Emily)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Christa Tacker. Kindred Healthcare LLC served on 1/31/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Christa Tacker. Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/2/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christa Tacker. Fee $402; Receipt No. LIT085256. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacker v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Tacker
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Emily E. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?