Heritage Company Inc v. Hudson Excess Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Heritage Company Inc
Defendant: Hudson Excess Insurance Company, Corvus Insurance Agency LLC and GCG Risk Management Consultants LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00082
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Filing 14 Deficiency Letter notifying party that #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice lacks an original signature. See F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1). (kbc)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Louis Franecke. Fee $100.00 - Receipt Number LIT086080. Filed by Heritage Company Inc. (jap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by GCG Risk Management Consultants LLC (Frase, John)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Corvus Insurance Agency LLC (Frase, John)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant, Hudson Excess Insurance Company; and admitting Jessica Gallinaro and Edward Brown to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 02/10/2022. (llg)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Edward Brown. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4199161. Filed by Hudson Excess Insurance Company (Donovan, David)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jessica Gallinaro. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4199151. Filed by Hudson Excess Insurance Company (Donovan, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/8/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/22/2022. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 3/6/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nickolas W. Dunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dunn, Nickolas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) filed by Hudson Excess Insurance Company. (llg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Hudson Excess Insurance Company. (llg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Corvus Insurance Agency LLC and GCG Risk Management Consultants LLC. (llg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, AND BAD FAITH against All Defendants filed by Heritage Company Inc. (llg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hudson Excess Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-21-03214. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT085383. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Company Inc v. Hudson Excess Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Company Inc
Represented By: Charles Darwin Davidson, Sr
Represented By: Nickolas W. Dunn
Represented By: Louis S. Franecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Excess Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Represented By: David H Topol
Represented By: Edward R Brown
Represented By: Jessica N Gallinaro
Represented By: Edward R. Brown
Represented By: Jessica N. Gallinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corvus Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: John Frase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCG Risk Management Consultants LLC
Represented By: John Frase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?