Pieper v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Eric J Pieper
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv00087
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/4/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/18/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 4/17/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Home Depot USA Inc (Higgins, Kristin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Home Depot USA Inc.(Higgins, Kristin)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant; and admitting Kristin Snyder Higgins to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 02/28/2022. (llg)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kristin Snyder Higgins. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4211184. Filed by Home Depot USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kristin S. Higgins)(Hodges, M.)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Home Depot USA Inc answer due 3/7/2022.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/25/2022. (amr)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Home Depot USA Inc (Hodges, M.)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Kimberly Hodges on behalf of Home Depot USA Inc (Hodges, M.)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service Proof of Service, filed by Eric J Pieper. Home Depot USA Inc served on 1/31/2022. (Jones, Stephen)
February 1, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include, "Summons issued and returned to counsel for service." (cmn)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Home Depot USA Inc filed by Eric J Pieper. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085414.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Docket text modified on 2/1/2022 to correct description.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pieper v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J Pieper
Represented By: Stephen W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Kristin Snyder Higgins
Represented By: M. Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?