Greathouse v. Baptist Health
Plaintiff: Gloria Greathouse and Gloria M Greathouse
Defendant: Baptist Health
Case Number: 4:2022cv00138
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/10/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/23/2022; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 9/5/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/8/2022. (ljb)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Audra K. Hamilton, I on behalf of Baptist Health (Hamilton, Audra)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Baptist Health.(Freeland, Byron)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron L. Freeland on behalf of Baptist Health (Freeland, Byron)
February 15, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as "Gloria M Greathouse" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document was added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gloria Greathouse against Baptist Health. (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT085572.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (ldb) Additional attachment added on 2/14/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greathouse v. Baptist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Greathouse
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria M Greathouse
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: Audra K. Hamilton, I
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?