Simpson et al v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Williams Simpson, Denise Ennett, Wanda King, Charles E Bolden, Linda Chesterfield and Anika Whitfield
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2022cv00213
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
2 Judge: David R Stras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Senator Tom Cotton's motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 05/03/2022. (llg)
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arkansas, State of, Tom Cotton, Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time; and giving Plaintiffs until 05/09/2022 to file a response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 04/26/2022. (llg)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time To Respond To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Mays, Richard)
April 15, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by Tom Cotton (Attachments: #1 proposed Brief of Senator Cotton as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants) (jap)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing that a three-judge panel will be convened. The Court has notified Chief Judge Lavenski R. Smith of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, and Chief Judge Smith has notified the Court that Circuit Judge David R. Stras and District Chief Judge D.P. Marshall Jr. have been designated to serve on a three-judge panel, along with the undersigned. The Court orders the parties to confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and submit a report by 4/28/2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/29/2022. (ldb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Defendants of Non-opposition to Request for a Three-judge Panel (Jacobs, Dylan)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint; and giving them until 04/12/2022 to respond. If Defendants oppose the request for a three-judge panel, their objection must be filed by 03/23/2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 03/16/2022. (llg)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service on State of Arkansas by Charles E Bolden, Linda Chesterfield, Denise Ennett, Wanda King, Jackie Williams Simpson, Anika Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mays, Richard)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service on Asa Hutchinson, Governor of the State of Arkansas by Charles E Bolden, Linda Chesterfield, Denise Ennett, Wanda King, Jackie Williams Simpson, Anika Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mays, Richard)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service on John Thurston, Arkansas Secretary of State by Charles E Bolden, Linda Chesterfield, Denise Ennett, Wanda King, Jackie Williams Simpson, Anika Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Mays, Richard)
March 8, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document as "COMPLAINT and Request for Three-Judge Panel" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Three-Judge Panel against All Defendants filed by Anika Whitfield, Denise Ennett, Charles E Bolden, Linda Chesterfield, Jackie Williams Simpson and Wanda King. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT085867.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Docket text modified on 3/8/2022 to correct the description.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Williams Simpson
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Ennett
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda King
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Bolden
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Chesterfield
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Whitfield
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?