United Financial Casualty Company v. Clark Auto Recovery & Towing LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Defendant: Clark Auto Recovery & Towing LLC, Clark Auto Recovery, Tonya Clark Auto Recovery, Timothy Clark, Jr, TC Towing and Recovery LLC, Tonya Clark, Jason Hewett, Peggy Clark, Clark Towing and Auto Recovery, Cherise Washington, Mia S Jefferies, James R Pennington, G&W Diesel Service Incorporated, Rojshawn ONeil Fletcher, Sherry D Lenington, Carco Carriage Corporation, Wendy M Perceful, Martha E Shaw, Tresa L Johnson and Shalonda A Williams
Case Number: 4:2022cv00234
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Filing 20 Peggy Clark, d/b/a Clark Towing's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Peggy Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Franks, Adam)
May 6, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam D. Franks on behalf of Peggy Clark (Franks, Adam)
May 5, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Mia Jefferies, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Mia S Jefferies served on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card with tracking)(Denton, Deborah)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service on TC Towing, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. TC Towing and Recovery LLC served on 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card with tracking)(Denton, Deborah)
May 4, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Carco Carriage Corporation (Honea, Robert)
May 3, 2022 Filing 15 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #13 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Honea on behalf of Carco Carriage Corporation (Honea, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carco Carriage Corporation.(Honea, Robert)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Martha E. Shaw, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Martha E Shaw served on 4/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Wendy M Perceful, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Wendy M Perceful served on 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card with tracking)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service on James R Pennington, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. James R Pennington served on 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Sherry D. Lenington, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Sherry D Lenington served on 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Jason Hewett, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Jason Hewett served on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Carco Carriage Corporation, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Carco Carriage Corporation served on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card with transmittal letter)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Clark Towing and Auto Recovery, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Clark Towing and Auto Recovery served on 4/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit green card)(Denton, Deborah)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/29/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/12/2022. Proposed Jury Trial sometime during the week of for 5/8/2023 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion to Extend Time to file an Answer or responsive pleading. Pleading is due June 20, 2022. The Defendant may file another motion for extension if more time is needed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/20/2022. (sjh)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint by Cherise Washington (Manis, Howard)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard B. Manis on behalf of Cherise Washington (Manis, Howard)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand filed by United Financial Casualty Company against All Defendants. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT085948.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Company v. Clark Auto Recovery & Towing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Auto Recovery & Towing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Auto Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Clark Auto Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Clark, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TC Towing and Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Clark
Represented By: Adam D. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Towing and Auto Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherise Washington
Represented By: Howard B. Manis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mia S Jefferies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&W Diesel Service Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rojshawn ONeil Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry D Lenington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carco Carriage Corporation
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy M Perceful
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha E Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tresa L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalonda A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Deborah S. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?