Cobb v. Pulaski County, Arkansas
Plaintiff: Leroy Cobb
Defendant: Pulaski County, Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2022cv00249
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12131 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/6/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/20/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/08/2022. (tmw)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pulaski County, Arkansas.(Neemann, Camille)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Marie Neemann on behalf of Pulaski County, Arkansas (Neemann, Camille)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pulaski County, Arkansas, filed by Leroy Cobb. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT086002.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Pulaski County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Cobb
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County, Arkansas
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?