Galloway v. Coney et al
Plaintiff: David Galloway
Defendant: Katelyn Coney and LPL Financial LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00336
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Galloway. (Dudley, Timothy)
June 7, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by David Galloway(Dudley, Timothy)
June 1, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LPL Financial LLC. (Dixon, Andrew)
June 1, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 Deficiency Letter re #12 Motion to Extend Time notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #12 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 1 June 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/24/2022. (slb)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Respond Otherwise by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Vinson on behalf of Katelyn Coney (Vinson, Thomas)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Katelyn Coney.(Vinson, Thomas)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #4 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 25 May 2022. Motions, Doc. #5 & #6 , granted. John W. Joyce and Chloe M. Chetta are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/2022. (slb)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of LPL Financial LLC (Chiles, E.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Chloe M. Chetta. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4258151. Filed by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by John W. Joyce. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4258146. Filed by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Respond Otherwise by LPL Financial LLC (Dixon, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of summons and complaint , filed by David Galloway. LPL Financial LLC served on 4/13/2022. (Dudley, Timothy)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of summons and complaint , filed by David Galloway. Katelyn Coney served on 4/19/2022. (Dudley, Timothy)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Galloway against All Defendants. (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT086354.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Coney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Galloway
Represented By: Timothy O. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelyn Coney
Represented By: Thomas V. Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPL Financial LLC
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: John W. Joyce
Represented By: Andrew S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?