Wright v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rocky Allen Wright
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00374
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocky Allen Wright. Social Security Administration served on 5/11/2022. (Osterhout, Karl)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/29/2022. (jbh)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk to issue Summons, without prepayment of fees and costs, to Plaintiff's counsel, who is responsible for service of the Complaint and Summons in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 4/26/2022. (jbh)
April 26, 2022 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jbh)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Rocky Allen Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rocky Allen Wright. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Allen Wright
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?