Rutledge v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Rutledge
Defendant: Evernorth Health Inc, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, MedCo Health Solutions Inc, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark Rx LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark LLC, UnitedHealth Group Inc, Optum Inc, OptumRx Inc, OptumRx Holdings LLC and Optuminsight Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv00549
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Filing 57 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Rutledge.(Rogers, Gary) (Docket text modified on 8/8/2022 to correct description.)(cmn)
August 8, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #57 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Rutledge" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to file the Amended Complaint before 5:00 pm on 8/9/2022. Responses are due forty-five (45) days later. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/5/2022. (sjh)
August 4, 2022 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Leslie Rutledge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redlines)(Rogers, Gary)
August 4, 2022 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by All Defendants (Fairley, John)
July 27, 2022 Filing 53 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/19/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/3/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/25/2024 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; and admitting William D. Coglianese to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/26/2022. (llg)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #50 Motion to Substitute Attorney's law firm. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/26/2022. (amr)
July 26, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION to Substitute Attorney 's Firm by Leslie Rutledge (Rogers, Gary)
July 25, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William D. Coglianese. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4313962. Filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #45 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; and admitting Theresa C. Martin to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/22/2022. (llg)
July 21, 2022 Filing 47 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Leslie Rutledge. Amendment to #46 Notice of Appearance Kimberly DuVall Renteria (Renteria, Kimberly)
July 20, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Renteria on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Renteria, Kimberly)
July 20, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Theresa C. Martin. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4311163. Filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn)
July 19, 2022 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn)
July 19, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 , #40 , and #41 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of separate Defendant Novo Nordisk, Inc.; and admitting Neal A. Potischman, James P. Rouhandeh, and Andrew Yaphe to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/18/2022. (llg)
July 14, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew Yaphe. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4307149. Filed by Novo Nordisk Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica)
July 14, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James P. Rouhandeh. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4307141. Filed by Novo Nordisk Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica)
July 14, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Neal A. Potischman. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4307120. Filed by Novo Nordisk Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica)
July 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #31 , #32 , #33 , #34 , and #35 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the attorneys entering appearance as Atticus William DeProspo, Craig Singer, Enu Mainigi, R. Kennon Poteat III, and Daniel Dockery as marked on the documents.(jak)
July 12, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Harvey on behalf of ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, MedCo Health Solutions Inc (Harvey, Patrick)
July 12, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Scherr on behalf of ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, MedCo Health Solutions Inc (Scherr, Jason)
July 11, 2022 Filing 36 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kimberly Renteria re #29 Order, #30 Order. (fjg)
July 11, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Dockery on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2022 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
July 11, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Kennon Poteat, III on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2022 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
July 11, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Enu Mainigi on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2022 to correct the attorney entering appearance)(jak)
July 11, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Singer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2022 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
July 11, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Atticus William DeProspo on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Docket text modified on 7/14/2022 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 , #25 , #26 , #27 , #28 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Dan Dockery, Enu Mainigi, Kennon Poteat, Atticus DeProspo and Craig Singer are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2022. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 , #23 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Jason S. Scherr and Patrick A. Harvey are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/8/2022. (jbh)
July 8, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Craig Singer. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302373. Filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Court Admissions)(Owens, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Atticus DeProspo. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302367. Filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Kennon Poteat. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302364. Filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Enu Mainigi. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302362. Filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Dan Dockery. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302313. Filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel)
July 8, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Patrick A. Harvey. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302227. Filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, MedCo Health Solutions Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
July 8, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jason R. Scherr. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4302148. Filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc, MedCo Health Solutions Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
July 7, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Optum Inc, OptumRx Holdings LLC, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, UnitedHealth Group Inc (Drennon, Baxter)
July 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Baxter D. Drennon on behalf of Optum Inc, OptumRx Holdings LLC, OptumRx Inc, Optuminsight Inc, UnitedHealth Group Inc (Drennon, Baxter)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Garner Watkins, III on behalf of Leslie Rutledge (Watkins, Walter)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin S Gault, Jr on behalf of Leslie Rutledge (Gault, Edwin)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Dearman Ellis on behalf of Leslie Rutledge (Ellis, Tanya)
June 30, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Novo Nordisk Inc (Koehler, Jessica)
June 30, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Pruitt Koehler on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Koehler, Jessica)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Irby on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Irby, Scott)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon S. Rather, Jr on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc (Rather, Gordon)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants have until Monday, August 8, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/15/22. (dpb)
June 15, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Notice. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filer as Caremark PCS Health LLC as marked on the document. (jak)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc (Baker, John)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #5 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Reece Owens on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Joint Motion) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Caremark PCS Health LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Fairley, John) (Docket text modified on 6/15/2022 to correct the party filer) (jak)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc.(Baker, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Leslie Rutledge.(cmn)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-02976. Fee $402 receipt number LIT087106. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health Inc
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc
Represented By: Andrew Yaphe
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Pruitt Koehler
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Theresa Coughlin Martin
Represented By: William D. Coglianese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedCo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Jason S. Scherr
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Patrick A. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Atticus William DeProspo
Represented By: Craig Darren Singer
Represented By: Daniel Martin Dockery
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Raymond Kennon Poteat, III
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Atticus William DeProspo
Represented By: Craig Darren Singer
Represented By: Daniel Martin Dockery
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Raymond Kennon Poteat, III
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx LLC
Represented By: Atticus William DeProspo
Represented By: Craig Darren Singer
Represented By: Daniel Martin Dockery
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Raymond Kennon Poteat, III
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health LLC
Represented By: Atticus William DeProspo
Represented By: Craig Darren Singer
Represented By: Daniel Martin Dockery
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Raymond Kennon Poteat, III
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Atticus William DeProspo
Represented By: Craig Darren Singer
Represented By: Daniel Martin Dockery
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Raymond Kennon Poteat, III
Represented By: Daniel Reece Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Inc
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Holdings LLC
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight Inc
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rutledge
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Represented By: Gary Rogers
Represented By: Kim DuVall Renteria
Represented By: Shannon L. Halijan
Represented By: Edwin S Gault, Jr.
Represented By: Gary B. Rogers
Represented By: Kimberly Renteria
Represented By: Tanya Dearman Ellis
Represented By: Walter Garner Watkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?