Templin v. Does
Plaintiff: Joseph Templin and Joey Templin
Defendant: Does, Does Mary Kathrine, Assistant Jail Administrator, Robert Guilbert, Lance Bonds and Lilly Roberts
Case Number: 4:2022cv00564
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #20 Appellate Filing Fee Notice. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the date filed as 8/3/2022 as indicated by the document. (cmn)
August 3, 2022 Filing 20 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh) (Docket entry modified on 8/5/2022 to correct date filed.)(cmn)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT: Based on the #18 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2022. (jbh)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER adopting #13 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; dismissing this case without prejudice; denying as moot #14 motion for order; counting this dismissal as a "strike"; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting the recommendations and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/1/2022. (jbh)
August 1, 2022 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #13 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Joseph Templin. (llg)
August 1, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by Joseph Templin. (llg)
July 27, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Joseph Templin. (ldb)
July 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Order by Joseph Templin. (ldb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; this dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); and the Court certify, that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 07/19/2022. (llg)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Court by Joseph Templin. (ldb)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Templin. (ldb)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court by Joseph Templin. (kdr)
July 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE to Court by Joseph Templin. (kdr)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend as to correcting the spelling of Defendant Guilbert's name; and denying as to any other relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/11/2022. (ldb)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Joseph Templin re #1 Complaint. Previously resent to updated address. (jbh)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Correct and NOTICE to the Court by Joseph Templin. (llg)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Stone County Detention Center; directing the Plaintiff to submit a Second Amended Complaint for the Court's review within 30 days, if he wishes; and directing the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/7/2022. (ldb)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joseph Templin. (llg)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Templin. (llg)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Plaintiff submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/22/2022. (ldb)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Joseph Templin.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Templin v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Mary Kathrine, Assistant Jail Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Guilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?