McBryde v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Amy Denise McBryde
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00572
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. Plaintiff is reminded it is her responsibility to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on the Commissioner, Attorney General, and the United States Attorney by certified mail and, once complete, to file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/22/2022. (lej)
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee received. Amount $402.00, Receipt # LIT087219. (fjg)
June 22, 2022 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel by mail. (jbh)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 30 days of the entry of this order or show cause why she is unable to pay the $402 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/21/2022. (jbh)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Amy Denise McBryde against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amy Denise McBryde. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBryde v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Denise McBryde
Represented By: James Gerard Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?