Ragins v. Pace Industries
Plaintiff: Daveon M Ragins
Defendant: Pace Industries
Case Number: 4:2022cv00598
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff Daveon Ragins's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for service upon Defendant Pace Industries, through its registered agent, C.T. Corporation System and deliver the summons, along with a copy of the Complaint and this Order, to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas for service on Defendant, consistent with the provisions of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/13/2022. (llg)
July 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to Pace Industries and delivered to the United States Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas for service. (llg)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 06/29/2022. (llg)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Pace Industries filed by Daveon M Ragins. (llg)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daveon M Ragins. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragins v. Pace Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daveon M Ragins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?