Contreras v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Juan Contreras
Defendant: Higgins, Calvin, Thompson and Does Unknown Deputies (Housing Unit Officers), PCDC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00918
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/17/2022. (llg)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Contreras claims due to a lack of prosecution. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/17/2022. (llg)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Juan Contreras re #4 Order. (kth)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Juan Contreras re #1 Complaint, #2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs, IFP application. (fjg)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Mr. Contreras to notify the Court of his current address within 30 days if he wants to pursue this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/11/2022. (ldb)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Juan Contreras re #2 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs. (fjg)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to enclose, along with a copy of this Order, a new IFP application; and directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2022. (ldb)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Juan Contreras.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Unknown Deputies (Housing Unit Officers), PCDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?