Terry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert Lance Terry
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2022cv00962
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has now paid the filing fee; as such, the pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on November 21, 2022. (cnm)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee received. Amount $402.00, Receipt # LIT089047. (fjg)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court hereby directs Plaintiff to provide within 14 days of this Order some explanation as to why he is unable to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2022. (lmc)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court hereby directs Plaintiff to provide within 14 days of this Order some explanation as to why he is unable to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/18/2022. (lmc)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Robert Lance Terry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Lance Terry. (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lance Terry
Represented By: Daniel Allen Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?